This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/08/2022 at 09:05:08 (UTC).

May, Gloria Cunninghamm

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 May, Gloria Cunninghamm was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

May, Gloria Cunninghamm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Dickson, David William

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

11/10/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

11/10/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/10/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/10/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/10/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

11/14/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Order to Relinquish Firearms

11/14/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

11/14/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $2,000.00; 580448583-6; Count: 1

11/14/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $2,000.00; 580448583-6; Count: 1

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

11/15/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

11/17/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

12/02/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

12/02/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Felony on 12/5/2022 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory of Firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Relinquish Firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 11/10/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/5/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike 784.08(2)(C) On Person 65 Yoa Or Older

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike 784.08(2)(C) On Person 65 Yoa Or Older; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Disposition Date: 2022-12-02; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less