This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/06/2022 at 10:07:05 (UTC).

Maniatopoulos, Irene Chrysovalantou

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 Maniatopoulos, Irene Chrysovalantou was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Maniatopoulos, Irene Chrysovalantou

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

Gonzalez, Diane Muenze

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

10/07/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

10/07/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

10/07/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

10/07/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

10/07/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Email Permission Form

10/07/2022: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-052004; Count: 1

10/10/2022: Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-052004; Count: 1

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

10/19/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

10/19/2022: Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

10/20/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice to Clerk

10/20/2022: Notice to Clerk

Notice to Appear

10/31/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

11/07/2022: Notice of Discovery

Motion for Continuance

11/28/2022: Motion for Continuance

Order Granting Continuance

11/28/2022: Order Granting Continuance

Notice to Appear

11/28/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

11/29/2022: Notice of Discovery

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: EVK; Notes: Early Resolution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSet on Early Resolution Hearings docket 1/3/2023 beginning at 1:30 PM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCancelled Early Resolution Hearings on 1/3/2023 1:30:00 PM due to Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSet on Early Resolution Hearings docket 1/3/2023 beginning at 1:30 PM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCancelled Early Resolution Hearings on 11/29/2022 1:30:00 PM due to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPer Judge's Office Early Resolution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-052004; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 10/31/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-10-31; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less