This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/23/2022 at 10:04:02 (UTC).

Maldonado, Martin Dejesus

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 Maldonado, Martin Dejesus was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Maldonado, Martin Dejesus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

Gonzalez, Diane Muenze

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

08/24/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

08/24/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

08/24/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

08/24/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

08/24/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Email Permission Form

08/25/2022: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $5,000.00; Psc 5-1868535; Count: 1

08/25/2022: Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $5,000.00; Psc 5-1868535; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $5,000.00; Psc 5-1868536; Count: 2

08/25/2022: Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $5,000.00; Psc 5-1868536; Count: 2

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

09/12/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 2

09/13/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 2

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

09/13/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

09/13/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice to Appear

09/19/2022: Notice to Appear

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

09/19/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: No

Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

10/10/2022: Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Appear

10/11/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

10/17/2022: Notice of Discovery

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketContinued to 11/29/2022 1:30 PM Early Resolution Hearings Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketRequest of Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Foster, Joseph G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Early Resolution Hearings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 9/19/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 790.01(2) Carry Concealed Firearm; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 790.01(2) Carry Concealed Firearm; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • ChargeCarry Concealed Firearm; Count: 2; Statute #: 790.01(2); Disposition Date: 2022-09-13; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • ChargeCarry Concealed Firearm; Count: 1; Statute #: 790.01(2); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-09-19; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less