This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/09/2022 at 10:01:55 (UTC).

Jean Louis, Malique Jacquez

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Jean Louis, Malique Jacquez was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Jean Louis, Malique Jacquez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Raab, Lawrence Allen

Brown, Christopher Hayden

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear

07/28/2022: Notice to Appear

Order Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record Ward, Zachary Howes BAR # 112272 (Public Defender)

07/14/2022: Order Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record Ward, Zachary Howes BAR # 112272 (Public Defender)

Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record -

07/13/2022: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record -

Notice of Discovery

07/07/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

07/05/2022: Notice to Appear

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

07/01/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 5

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 5

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

07/01/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

06/30/2022: Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

Notice of Appearance from Brown, Christopher Hayden, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

06/30/2022: Notice of Appearance from Brown, Christopher Hayden, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

06/17/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

06/15/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,500.00; 2022-Aa-033446; Count: 5

06/15/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,500.00; 2022-Aa-033446; Count: 5

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-033445; Count: 4

06/15/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-033445; Count: 4

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,500.00; 2022-Aa-033444; Count: 3

06/15/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,500.00; 2022-Aa-033444; Count: 3

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-033443; Count: 2

06/15/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-033443; Count: 2

First Appearance Court Order

06/13/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Email Permission Form

06/13/2022: Email Permission Form

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Calendar Call; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Pre-Trial; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketContinued to 3/6/2023 9:00 AM Jury Trial Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketContinued to 2/28/2023 9:00 AM Calendar Call Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketContinued to 1/3/2023 9:00 AM Pre-Trial Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 790.27(2) Possess, Sell, Deliver Firearm With Serial Number Altered, Removed; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • ChargeCarry Concealed Firearm; Count: 5; Statute #: 790.01(2); Disposition Date: 2022-07-01; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • ChargePossess, Sell, Deliver Firearm with Serial Number Altered, Removed; Count: 4; Statute #: 790.27(2); Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2022-07-05; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 3; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-07-05; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.147(1); Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2022-07-05; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-07-05; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less