This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/28/2022 at 09:14:14 (UTC).

Higgins, Sarah Nicole

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Higgins, Sarah Nicole was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Higgins, Sarah Nicole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Heiderscheit, N Stowe

Dickson, David William

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

11/30/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

11/30/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/30/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/30/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/30/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

12/01/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Order to Relinquish Firearms

12/01/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

12/01/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

12/13/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

12/14/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

12/21/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice to Appear

12/27/2022: Notice to Appear

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketContinued to 2/23/2023 9:00 AM Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McFee, Shannon H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Docket784.045(1)(A)2 Aggravated Battery Uses Deadly Weapon; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 11/30/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Provost, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/27/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.045(1)(A)2 Aggravated Battery Uses Deadly Weapon; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • ChargeAggravated Battery Uses Deadly Weapon; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.045(1)(a)2; Offense Level: FS; Plea Date: 2022-12-27; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less