This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 01/19/2023 at 07:01:02 (UTC).

Gutierrez, Jesus Santiago

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Gutierrez, Jesus Santiago was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brown, Michael J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brown, Michael J

 

Party Details

Defendant

Gutierrez, Jesus Santiago

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Damrath, Colleen T

Maurer, Valerie Anne

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/12/2023: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/12/2023: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/12/2023: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/12/2023: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/12/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Email Permission Form

01/12/2023: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $2,000.00; 2023-Aa-011184; Count: 1

01/12/2023: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $2,000.00; 2023-Aa-011184; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $2,000.00; 2023-Aa-011185; Count: 2

01/12/2023: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $2,000.00; 2023-Aa-011185; Count: 2

Notice of Appearance from Maurer, Valerie Anne, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

01/17/2023: Notice of Appearance from Maurer, Valerie Anne, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Misdemeanor; Location: Naples; Room: 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Maurer, Valerie Anne, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Misdemeanor docket 2/1/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $2,000.00; 2023-Aa-011185; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $2,000.00; 2023-Aa-011184; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(B) Possess Marijuana < 20 Grams; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.147(1); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • ChargePossess Marijuana < 20 grams; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(b); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less