This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/11/2023 at 09:02:01 (UTC).

Groves, Megan Marie

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 Groves, Megan Marie was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Groves, Megan Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

PD, Public Defender

 

Court Documents

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

01/09/2023: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Order to Set Aside Bench Warrant and Bond Forfeiture

01/09/2023: Order to Set Aside Bench Warrant and Bond Forfeiture

Notice to Appear

01/09/2023: Notice to Appear

Bench Warrant/Pick Up Order Issued

01/09/2023: Bench Warrant/Pick Up Order Issued

Clerk's Notification of Bond Forfeiture

01/09/2023: Clerk's Notification of Bond Forfeiture

Clerk's Notification of Bond Forfeiture

01/09/2023: Clerk's Notification of Bond Forfeiture

Clerk's Notification of Bond Forfeiture

01/09/2023: Clerk's Notification of Bond Forfeiture

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

01/06/2023: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

01/06/2023: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/06/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/27/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-061578; Count: 4

12/14/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-061578; Count: 4

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-061577; Count: 3

12/14/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-061577; Count: 3

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-061576; Count: 2

12/14/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-061576; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-061575; Count: 1

12/14/2022: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-061575; Count: 1

Driving Record

12/14/2022: Driving Record

Email Permission Form

12/14/2022: Email Permission Form

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/14/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Set Aside Bench Warrant and Bond Forfeiture

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketWarrant received by CCSO electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBench Warrant/Pick Up Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketContinued to 2/23/2023 9:00 AM Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-061575; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 817.60(1) Theft By Taking, Retaining Possession Of Another's Credit Card; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 812.014(2)(E) Petit Theft 1St Degree $100 - < $750; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 817.61 Illegal Use Of Credit Cards More Than 2 Times In 6 Months Or Obtain Goods, Money $100 Or More; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 817.568(2)(A) Fraudulent Use Of Personal Identification Information; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • ChargeTheft by Taking, Retaining Possession of Another's Credit Card; Count: 4; Statute #: 817.60(1); Disposition Date: 2023-01-06; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • ChargePetit Theft 1st Degree $100 - < $750; Count: 3; Statute #: 812.014(2)(e); Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2023-01-09; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • ChargeIllegal Use of Credit Cards More than 2 Times in 6 Months or Obtain Goods, Money $100 or More; Count: 2; Statute #: 817.61; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2023-01-09; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2022
  • ChargeFraudulent Use of Personal Identification Information; Count: 1; Statute #: 817.568(2)(a); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2023-01-09; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less