This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/22/2022 at 10:49:36 (UTC).

Griffin JR, Marwin Alonzo, GRIFFIN, MARWIN ALONZA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Griffin JR, Marwin Alonzo, GRIFFIN, MARWIN ALONZA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Manalich, Ramiro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Manalich, Ramiro

 

Party Details

Defendants

Griffin JR, Marwin Alonzo

GRIFFIN, MARWIN ALONZO

GRIFFIN, MARWIN ALONZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Frazier, Brock R

Brown, Christopher Hayden

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/21/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/21/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/21/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/21/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/21/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

01/24/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $25,000.00; U25-21263575; Count: 1

01/24/2022: Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $25,000.00; U25-21263575; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $25,000.00; U25-21263576; Count: 2

01/24/2022: Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $25,000.00; U25-21263576; Count: 2

Notice of Appearance from Brown, Christopher Hayden, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

02/01/2022: Notice of Appearance from Brown, Christopher Hayden, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

02/01/2022: Notice of Intent to Participate in Discovery

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

02/14/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

02/14/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice to Appear

02/14/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice to Clerk

02/14/2022: Notice to Clerk

Driving Record

02/17/2022: Driving Record

Notice of Discovery

03/01/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

03/07/2022: Notice to Appear

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management; Location: Naples; Room: RM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: 3-4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketContinued to 4/22/2022 9:00 AM Case Management Manalich, Ramiro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Foster, Joseph G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 2/14/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM Manalich, Ramiro (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 1/21/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Provost, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(1)(A)1 Possess With Intent To Sell, Deliver, Manufacture Controlled Substance; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(1)(A)1 Sell Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • ChargeTrafficking in Cocaine 28 to < 200 grams; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.135(1)(b)1; Offense Level: FF; Plea Date: 2022-03-07; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • ChargeSell Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(1)(a)1; Offense Level: FS; Plea Date: 2022-03-07; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less