This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/27/2022 at 09:05:29 (UTC).

Gordon, Katherine Marie

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Gordon, Katherine Marie was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Gordon, Katherine Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Day Jr, Donald Paul

Santini, Nicole N

 

Court Documents

Citation # ADX8UCE for 316.193(4)(a)1 issued on 11/28/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

11/29/2022: Citation # ADX8UCE for 316.193(4)(a)1 issued on 11/28/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

Booking Sheet

11/29/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

11/29/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/29/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/29/2022: JIS Certificate

Email Permission Form

11/29/2022: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-064322; Count: 1

11/29/2022: Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-064322; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $1,000.00; 2022-Aa-064323; Count: 2

11/29/2022: Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $1,000.00; 2022-Aa-064323; Count: 2

Driving Record

11/29/2022: Driving Record

Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

11/30/2022: Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Preserve Evidence

11/30/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Notice to Preserve Evidence

11/30/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Notice to Preserve Evidence

11/30/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Waiver of Appearance

12/01/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Referred or Transferred to Misdemeanor, Count(s) 1,2, Case # 11-2022-CT-004037-AXXX-XX

12/20/2022: Referred or Transferred to Misdemeanor, Count(s) 1,2, Case # 11-2022-CT-004037-AXXX-XX

E-filed Notice of No Information/Filed in Related Case

12/20/2022: E-filed Notice of No Information/Filed in Related Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filed Notice of No Information/Filed in Related Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Felony on 12/27/2022 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReferred or Transferred to Misdemeanor, Count(s) 1,2, Case # 11-2022-CT-004037-AXXX-XX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Preserve Evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Preserve Evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Preserve Evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/27/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 316.193(4)(A)1 Dui 1St Offense With Bac .15 Or > Or Accompanied By Minor; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 322.212(1)(B) Possess Similitude Dl; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # ADX8UCE for 316.193(4)(a)1 issued on 11/28/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • ChargeDUI 1st Offense with BAC .15 or > or Accompanied by Minor; Count: 2; Statute #: 316.193(4)(a)1; Disposition Date: 2022-12-20; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Transferred to Another Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • ChargePossess Similitude DL; Count: 1; Statute #: 322.212(1)(b); Disposition Date: 2022-12-20; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Transferred to Another Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less