This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/24/2022 at 10:08:41 (UTC).

Golden, Kathryn B

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 Golden, Kathryn B was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Golden, Kathryn B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Raab, Lawrence Allen

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

08/25/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

08/25/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

08/25/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

08/25/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

08/25/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

08/26/2022: First Appearance Court Order

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

09/12/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice to Clerk

09/13/2022: Notice to Clerk

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

09/13/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

09/15/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice to Appear

09/19/2022: Notice to Appear

Re-notice to Appear

10/13/2022: Re-notice to Appear

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Calendar Call; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Pre-Trial; Location: Naples; Room: EVK; Notes: March Trial Cycle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-notice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketSet on Jury Trial docket 3/6/2023 beginning at 9:00 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketSet on Calendar Call docket 2/28/2023 beginning at 9:00 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketSet on Pre-Trial docket 1/3/2023 beginning at 9:00 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCancelled Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) on 11/17/2022 9:00:00 AM due to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketPer Judge's Office March Trial Cycle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 9/19/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 8/25/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.082(3) Battery By Person Detained In Prison, Jail; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • ChargeBattery by Person Detained in Prison, Jail; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.082(3); Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-09-19; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less