This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/19/2022 at 10:02:52 (UTC).

Gamboa Delgado, Oleide

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 Gamboa Delgado, Oleide was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Gamboa Delgado, Oleide

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

Gonzalez, Diane Muenze

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear

08/16/2022: Notice to Appear

Order Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record Kelley, Connie Sue BAR # 949809 (Public Defender)

08/01/2022: Order Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record Kelley, Connie Sue BAR # 949809 (Public Defender)

Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record -

08/01/2022: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record -

Notice of Discovery

07/15/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

07/11/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice to Clerk

07/08/2022: Notice to Clerk

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

07/08/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

07/08/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

07/05/2022: Notice of Appearance from Gonzalez, Diane Muenze, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

06/23/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

06/22/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Surety Bond by AA Alligator Bail Bonds - Patrisia Sola for $5,000.00; As6k-845335; Count: 1

06/20/2022: Surety Bond by AA Alligator Bail Bonds - Patrisia Sola for $5,000.00; As6k-845335; Count: 1

First Appearance Court Order

06/20/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/20/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

06/20/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

06/20/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

Jail Arrest Card

06/20/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Booking Sheet

06/20/2022: Booking Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketContinued to 9/6/2022 1:30 PM Early Resolution Hearings Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketRequest of Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Early Resolution Hearings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record Kelley, Connie Sue BAR # 949809 (Public Defender)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 7/11/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by AA Alligator Bail Bonds - Patrisia Sola for $5,000.00; As6k-845335; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AFUD3ME for 893.13(6)(a) issued on 06/19/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Citation #: AFUD3ME; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-07-11; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gonzalez, Diane Muenze

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilson, Tammera Jamell