This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 10:10:56 (UTC).

Gamble, Demarques Samuel

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Gamble, Demarques Samuel was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Gamble, Demarques Samuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Heiderscheit, N Stowe

Ramos, Toni A

OBrien, Aaron J

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

12/08/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

12/08/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1, 2

12/08/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1, 2

Waiver of Appearance

11/29/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Notice of Appearance from OBrien, Aaron J, Written Plea of Not Guilty

11/29/2022: Notice of Appearance from OBrien, Aaron J, Written Plea of Not Guilty

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

11/22/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

11/16/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Inventory of Firearms

11/15/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Order to Relinquish Firearms

11/15/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

First Appearance Court Order

11/15/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Email Permission Form

11/14/2022: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $5,000.00; Psc 15-1869617; Count: 2

11/14/2022: Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $5,000.00; Psc 15-1869617; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $2,000.00; Psc 15-1869616; Count: 1

11/14/2022: Surety Bond by Pirate Style Bailbonds - James White for $2,000.00; Psc 15-1869616; Count: 1

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/14/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

11/14/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/14/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

Jail Arrest Card

11/14/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Booking Sheet

11/14/2022: Booking Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1, 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketArraignment to be reset when the state files an information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from OBrien, Aaron J, Written Plea of Not Guilty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/5/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 827.03(2)(C) Child Abuse Without Causing Great Bodily Harm, Permanent Disability Or Permanent Disfigurement; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • ChargeChild Abuse without Causing Great Bodily Harm, Permanent Disability or Permanent Disfigurement; Count: 2; Statute #: 827.03(2)(c); Disposition Date: 2022-12-08; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Disposition Date: 2022-12-08; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less