This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/17/2023 at 08:06:46 (UTC).

Francisco Jose, Felipe

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Francisco Jose, Felipe was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Francisco Jose, Felipe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

PD, Public Defender

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/03/2023: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/03/2023: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/03/2023: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/03/2023: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/03/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

01/03/2023: First Appearance Court Order

Order to Relinquish Firearms

01/03/2023: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

01/03/2023: Inventory of Firearms

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

01/11/2023: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory of Firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Relinquish Firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNo Trespass Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNo Contact Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/23/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 914.22(1)(D) Tamper With Witness By Being Absent In Official 1St Degree Felony Proceeding; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2023
  • ChargeTamper with Witness by Being Absent in Official 1st Degree Felony Proceeding; Count: 1; Statute #: 914.22(1)(d); Offense Level: FF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less