This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/10/2023 at 08:02:53 (UTC).

Flora, Brent

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 Flora, Brent was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Flora, Brent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Santini, Nicole N

Day Jr, Donald Paul

PD, Public Defender

 

Court Documents

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

01/05/2023: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $3,500.00; 580451152-8; Count: 3

12/30/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $3,500.00; 580451152-8; Count: 3

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $3,500.00; 580451151-5; Count: 2

12/30/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $3,500.00; 580451151-5; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $7,500.00; 511515774-5; Count: 1

12/30/2022: Surety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $7,500.00; 511515774-5; Count: 1

Email Permission Form

12/30/2022: Email Permission Form

Waiver of Appearance

12/29/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

12/29/2022: Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

First Appearance Court Order

12/27/2022: First Appearance Court Order

First Appearance Court Order

12/27/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Inventory of Firearms

12/27/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Order to Relinquish Firearms

12/27/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

12/27/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Order to Relinquish Firearms

12/27/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/27/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/27/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

12/27/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/27/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

Jail Arrest Card

12/27/2022: Jail Arrest Card

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $3,500.00; 580451152-8; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $3,500.00; 580451151-5; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Nickel American Bail Bonds - Anthony Bennett for $7,500.00; 511515774-5; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNo Trespass Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/17/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike 784.08(2)(C) On Person 65 Yoa Or Older; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 3; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 2; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less