This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/19/2022 at 10:04:06 (UTC).

Czarnecki, Brett Julian

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 Czarnecki, Brett Julian was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Czarnecki, Brett Julian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Boe, Connor M

Cavanaugh, Daniel M

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

06/20/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

06/20/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

06/20/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

06/20/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/20/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

06/21/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Order to Relinquish Firearms

06/21/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

06/21/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $25,000.00; 520022937-7; Count: 1

06/21/2022: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $25,000.00; 520022937-7; Count: 1

Notice to Preserve Evidence

06/22/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Waiver of Appearance

06/22/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

06/22/2022: Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Correspondence to Judge

06/23/2022: Correspondence to Judge

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

06/27/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

06/27/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: 3-4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketPer Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Felony on 7/11/2022 8:15:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence to Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Preserve Evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $25,000.00; 520022937-7; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: RC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 6/20/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 7/11/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.021(1)(A) Aggravated Assault With Deadly Weapon Without Intent To Kill; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2022
  • ChargeAggravated Assault with Deadly Weapon without Intent to Kill; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.021(1)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-06-27; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cavanaugh, Daniel M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boe, Connor M