This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 09:18:20 (UTC).

Columbo JR, George M

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Columbo JR, George M was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Columbo JR, George M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Maurer, Valerie Anne

Boe, Connor M

 

Court Documents

Information Capias

12/16/2022: Information Capias

Notice to Clerk

12/16/2022: Notice to Clerk

Capias Warrant

12/19/2022: Capias Warrant

Sworn Affidavit or Complaint

12/19/2022: Sworn Affidavit or Complaint

Warrant Served

12/22/2022: Warrant Served

Booking Sheet Served Capias/Arrest Warrant

12/22/2022: Booking Sheet Served Capias/Arrest Warrant

Jail Arrest Card

12/22/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/22/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/22/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/22/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Email Permission Form

12/22/2022: Email Permission Form

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $10,000.00; 2022-Bb-012744; Count: 1

12/22/2022: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $10,000.00; 2022-Bb-012744; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-070640; Count: 2

12/22/2022: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-070640; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-070639; Count: 3

12/22/2022: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-070639; Count: 3

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-070638; Count: 4

12/22/2022: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Mary Clark for $5,000.00; 2022-Aa-070638; Count: 4

Notice of Appearance from Maurer, Valerie Anne, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

12/27/2022: Notice of Appearance from Maurer, Valerie Anne, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Discovery

01/10/2023: Notice of Discovery

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Maurer, Valerie Anne, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/17/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet Served Capias/Arrest Warrant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWarrant Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 212.12(2)(C) Fail To File 6 Consecutive Returns With Intent To Evade Tax; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 212.12(2)(C) Fail To File 6 Consecutive Returns With Intent To Evade Tax; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 212.12(2)(C) Fail To File 6 Consecutive Returns With Intent To Evade Tax; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 212.15(2)(C) Fail To Remit Sales Tax $20,000 - < $100,000; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Capias

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • ChargeFail to File 6 Consecutive Returns with Intent to Evade Tax; Count: 4; Statute #: 212.12(2)(c); Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • ChargeFail to File 6 Consecutive Returns with Intent to Evade Tax; Count: 3; Statute #: 212.12(2)(c); Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • ChargeFail to File 6 Consecutive Returns with Intent to Evade Tax; Count: 2; Statute #: 212.12(2)(c); Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • ChargeFail to Remit Sales Tax $20,000 - < $100,000; Count: 1; Statute #: 212.15(2)(c); Offense Level: FS; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less