This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/06/2023 at 09:06:05 (UTC).

Cobb, Stacy Lashae

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 Cobb, Stacy Lashae was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Cobb, Stacy Lashae

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Cunningham, Deborah Jill

Dickson, David William

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

12/09/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

12/09/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

12/09/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

12/09/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

12/09/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

12/12/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Waiver of Extradition

12/13/2022: Waiver of Extradition

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

12/16/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

12/28/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Docket$50.00 Public Defender Application fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDefendant extradited; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Extradition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: RC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/3/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 12/9/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 941.13 Fugitive From Justice; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • ChargeFugitive From Justice; Court Action: Extradition; Count: 1; Statute #: 941.13; Disposition Date: 2023-01-03; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less