This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/27/2023 at 23:24:57 (UTC).

Chery, Fabiola Asmath

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 Chery, Fabiola Asmath was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Chery, Fabiola Asmath

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/20/2023: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/20/2023: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/20/2023: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/20/2023: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/20/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2023-Bb-006572; Count: 1

01/23/2023: Surety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2023-Bb-006572; Count: 1

Email Permission Form

01/23/2023: Email Permission Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Express Bail Bonds - Juanita Williams for $5,000.00; 2023-Bb-006572; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: RC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 2/13/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 1/20/2023 beginning at 2:00 PM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 812.014(3)(C) Petit Theft 3Rd Or Subsequent Offense; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • ChargePetit Theft 3rd or Subsequent Offense; Count: 1; Statute #: 812.014(3)(c); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less