This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/27/2022 at 09:04:56 (UTC).

Cavazos , Corey Allan

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Cavazos , Corey Allan was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Cavazos , Corey Allan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Ramos, Toni A

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

11/28/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

11/28/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/28/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/28/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

11/28/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Order to Relinquish Firearms

11/28/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

11/28/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Surety Bond by Gervaris Leaphart Bail Bonds - Gervaris Leaphart for $7,500.00; Aa22-786358; Count: 1

11/28/2022: Surety Bond by Gervaris Leaphart Bail Bonds - Gervaris Leaphart for $7,500.00; Aa22-786358; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Gervaris Leaphart Bail Bonds - Gervaris Leaphart for $2,500.00; Aa22-786359; Count: 2

11/28/2022: Surety Bond by Gervaris Leaphart Bail Bonds - Gervaris Leaphart for $2,500.00; Aa22-786359; Count: 2

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

12/08/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

12/13/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketArraignment to be reset when the state files an information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 12/19/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Gervaris Leaphart Bail Bonds - Gervaris Leaphart for $2,500.00; Aa22-786359; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory of Firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.07(2)(A) Assault On Leo, Firefighter, Emt, Etc; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.07(2)(B) Battery On Leo, Firefighter, Emt, Etc; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • ChargeAssault on LEO, Firefighter, EMT, etc; Count: 2; Statute #: 784.07(2)(a); Offense Level: MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • ChargeBattery on LEO, Firefighter, EMT, etc; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.07(2)(b); Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less