This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 12/16/2022 at 10:17:51 (UTC).

Camarillo JR, Roberto Carlos

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 Camarillo JR, Roberto Carlos was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Crown, Rob. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Crown, Rob

 

Party Details

Defendant

Camarillo JR, Roberto Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Gomes, Rhiannon A

Cavanaugh, Daniel M

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

10/17/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

10/17/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

10/17/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

10/17/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

10/17/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

10/18/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Order to Relinquish Firearms

10/18/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

10/18/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Waiver of Appearance

10/25/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

10/25/2022: Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Preserve Evidence

10/25/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/03/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice to Appear

11/08/2022: Notice to Appear

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

11/08/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - DV Hearing - Criminal; Location: Naples; Room: MJP; Notes: Arraignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCancelled DV Hearing - Criminal on 11/8/2022 10:00:00 AM due to Case Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCancelled DV Hearing - Criminal on 11/21/2022 9:00:00 AM due to Case Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: DV Hearing - Criminal; Location: Naples; Room: MJB; Notes: ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketContinued to 11/21/2022 9:00 AM DV Hearing - Criminal Provost, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketRequest of State

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketSet on DV Hearing - Criminal docket 11/8/2022 beginning at 10:00 AM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 10/17/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Provost, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Disposition Date: 2022-11-08; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less