This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/21/2022 at 10:04:10 (UTC).

BURKETT, JENNIFER FAYE, Sanders, Jennifer Faye Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 BURKETT, JENNIFER FAYE, Sanders, Jennifer Faye was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendants

Sanders, Jennifer Faye

BURKETT, JENNIFER FAYE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Hurst, Shannon Lynn

 

Court Documents

Credit time served 58 days

08/19/2022: Credit time served 58 days

Court Order Report of Disposition to Tallahassee

08/18/2022: Court Order Report of Disposition to Tallahassee

Score Sheet

08/17/2022: Score Sheet

Fingerprint Form

08/17/2022: Fingerprint Form

Plea Form

08/17/2022: Plea Form

Automated Judgment and Sentence

08/17/2022: Automated Judgment and Sentence

Notice to Appear

08/11/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

07/28/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

07/18/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice to Clerk

07/15/2022: Notice to Clerk

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

07/15/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

07/15/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

06/27/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

06/23/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

First Appearance Court Order

06/23/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/22/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

06/22/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

06/22/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples ; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCredit time served 58 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Order Report of Disposition to Tallahassee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketScore Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFingerprint Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlea Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Plea; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: Time Served; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • SentenceConfinement: State Prison; Term: Jail Time: 56 months DL Suspense Time: 6 months; Count: 3; Credit Time: Credit Time: 58 days; Status: Concurrent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • SentenceConfinement: State Prison; Term: Jail Time: 56 months DL Suspense Time: 6 months; Count: 2; Credit Time: Credit Time: 58 days; Status: Concurrent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 775.13(5)(A) Convicted Felon Fail To Register; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AFUD6FE for 893.13(6)(a) issued on 06/21/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Court Action: Adjudicated Guilty/Delinquent; Count: 4; Statute #: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2022-08-17; Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2022-08-17; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Court Action: Adjudicated Guilty/Delinquent; Count: 3; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-08-17; Sentence Status: Concurrent; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-08-17; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Court Action: Adjudicated Guilty/Delinquent; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-08-17; Sentence Status: Concurrent; Citation #: AFUD6FE; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-08-17; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • ChargeConvicted Felon Fail to Register; Court Action: Adjudicated Guilty/Delinquent; Count: 1; Statute #: 775.13(5)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-08-17; Offense Level: MS; Plea Date: 2022-08-17; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hurst, Shannon Lynn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mason, Laura Natasha