This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/06/2023 at 10:02:19 (UTC).

Brooks, Laura Kathambi

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 Brooks, Laura Kathambi was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Brooks, Laura Kathambi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Santini, Nicole N

Ramos, Toni A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Discovery

12/19/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

12/01/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

11/29/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Notice to Appear

11/28/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/22/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Paid $50.00 on receipt 1322182, Fully Paid

11/22/2022: Paid $50.00 on receipt 1322182, Fully Paid

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

11/22/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/21/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

11/21/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $5,000.00; 2022-Cc-005926; Count: 1

11/08/2022: Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $5,000.00; 2022-Cc-005926; Count: 1

Inventory of Firearms

11/08/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Order to Relinquish Firearms

11/08/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

First Appearance Court Order

11/08/2022: First Appearance Court Order

First Appearance Court Order

11/07/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Jail Arrest Card

11/07/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/07/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

11/07/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/07/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe); Location: Naples; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketContinued to 1/12/2023 9:00 AM Case Mgmt (PD/ProSe) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 11/7/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Brown, Michael J (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 11/28/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.07(2)(B) Battery On Leo, Firefighter, Emt, Etc; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.03(1)(A)1 Battery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike 784.08(2)(C) On Person 65 Yoa Or Older; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeBattery on LEO, Firefighter, EMT, etc; Count: 2; Statute #: 784.07(2)(b); Disposition Date: 2022-11-21; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeBattery Actual, Intentional Touch, Strike; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.03(1)(a)1; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-11-28; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less