This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/06/2023 at 10:01:08 (UTC).

Bolanos Lopez , Otto Fredy

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 Bolanos Lopez , Otto Fredy was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Bolanos Lopez , Otto Fredy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Mason, Laura Natasha

Upson, Giovana Linale

Ramos, Toni A

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

11/07/2022: Booking Sheet

First Appearance Court Order

11/07/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Order to Relinquish Firearms

11/07/2022: Order to Relinquish Firearms

Inventory of Firearms

11/07/2022: Inventory of Firearms

Jail Arrest Card

11/07/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

11/07/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

11/07/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/07/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

11/10/2022: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $10,000.00; 511513810-2; Count: 1

11/14/2022: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $10,000.00; 511513810-2; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $10,000.00; 511513811-5; Count: 2

11/14/2022: Surety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $10,000.00; 511513811-5; Count: 2

Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

11/14/2022: Notice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

Notice of Appearance from Upson, Giovana Linale, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

11/17/2022: Notice of Appearance from Upson, Giovana Linale, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/18/2022: Notice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1, 2, 3

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1, 2, 3

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

11/22/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

11/22/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCancelled Arraignment - Felony on 11/28/2022 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 1, 2, 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Adopting Victim Rights Under Florida Constitution (Marsy's Law) and Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance from Upson, Giovana Linale, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $10,000.00; 511513811-5; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Mary and Jimmys Bail Bonds - Michael Plummer for $10,000.00; 511513810-2; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Public Defender, Waiver of Arraignment, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Notice of Discovery and Initial Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNo Contact Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 11/28/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.147(1) Possess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 787.02(1)(A) False Imprisonment; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 784.041(2)(A) Domestic Battery By Strangulation; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargePossess, Use Drug Paraphernalia; Count: 3; Statute #: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2022-11-22; Offense Level: MF; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeFalse Imprisonment; Count: 2; Statute #: 787.02(1)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-11-22; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeDomestic Battery by Strangulation; Count: 1; Statute #: 784.041(2)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-11-22; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less