This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/23/2022 at 09:01:04 (UTC).

Bienaim, Vicknayda

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 Bienaim, Vicknayda was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Defendant

Bienaim, Vicknayda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Woodward, Sarah Ann

Cavanaugh, Daniel M

 

Court Documents

Jail Arrest Card

10/26/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

10/26/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

10/26/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

10/26/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Booking Sheet

10/26/2022: Booking Sheet

First Appearance Court Order

10/27/2022: First Appearance Court Order

Pretrial Supervision Order

10/27/2022: Pretrial Supervision Order

Pretrial Supervision Appointment Sheet

10/27/2022: Pretrial Supervision Appointment Sheet

Email Permission Form

10/27/2022: Email Permission Form

Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

11/07/2022: Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Preserve Evidence

11/07/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Waiver of Appearance

11/11/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Waiver of Appearance

11/13/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

11/17/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice to Appear

11/21/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

11/21/2022: Notice of Discovery

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Mgmt (Private Attorney); Location: Naples; Room: JOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketContinued to 12/22/2022 1:30 PM Case Mgmt (Private Attorney) McGowan, John O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McFee, Shannon H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketProceeding: Arraignment - Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 10/26/2022 beginning at 2:00 PM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 11/21/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 812.014(2)(C)1 Grand Theft - $750 - < $5,000; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 817.034(4)(A)3 Obtain Property By Fraud <$20,000; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • ChargeGrand Theft - $750 - < $5,000; Count: 2; Statute #: 812.014(2)(c)1; Disposition Date: 2022-11-17; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • ChargeObtain Property by Fraud <$20,000; Count: 1; Statute #: 817.034(4)(a)3; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-11-21; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less