This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 12/13/2022 at 10:04:16 (UTC).

Bell, Jordan Michael

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 Bell, Jordan Michael was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Provost, Michael J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Provost, Michael J

 

Party Details

Defendant

Bell, Jordan Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Newkirk, Amanda M

Cavanaugh, Daniel M

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

10/14/2022: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

10/14/2022: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

10/14/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

10/14/2022: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

10/14/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Driving Record

10/14/2022: Driving Record

Email Permission Form

10/14/2022: Email Permission Form

Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

10/26/2022: Notice of Appearance from Cavanaugh, Daniel M, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Notice to Preserve Evidence

10/26/2022: Notice to Preserve Evidence

Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-060777; Count: 1

10/31/2022: Surety Bond by Liberty Bail Bonds - Jessica Valderrama for $2,000.00; 2022-Aa-060777; Count: 1

Notice of Unavailability

11/04/2022: Notice of Unavailability

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

11/07/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Notice to Appear

11/09/2022: Notice to Appear

Waiver of Appearance

11/10/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Notice of Discovery

11/17/2022: Notice of Discovery

Notice to Appear

11/30/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

12/07/2022: Notice of Discovery

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Pre-Trial (Private Attorney); Location: Naples; Room: MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Pre-Trial (Private Attorney); Location: Naples; Room: MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketContinued to 1/4/2023 9:00 AM Pre-Trial (Private Attorney) Provost, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketRequest of Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Provost, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDriving Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Misdemeanor docket 11/9/2022 beginning at 8:30 AM Crown, Rob (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Permission Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 843.02 Resist/Obstruct Officer Without Violence; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • ChargeResist/Obstruct Officer without Violence; Count: 1; Statute #: 843.02; Offense Level: MF; Plea Date: 2022-11-09; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less