This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/17/2023 at 08:10:02 (UTC).

Aveille Rodriguez, Roberto

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Aveille Rodriguez, Roberto was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Aveille Rodriguez, Roberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Raab, Lawrence Allen

DeRobbio, Kyla Marie

 

Court Documents

Booking Sheet

01/03/2023: Booking Sheet

Jail Arrest Card

01/03/2023: Jail Arrest Card

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

01/03/2023: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

JIS Certificate

01/03/2023: JIS Certificate

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

01/03/2023: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

First Appearance Court Order

01/04/2023: First Appearance Court Order

Surety Bond by Get Smart Bail Bonds - Marty Belding for $5,000.00; As5 1466905; Count: 1

01/04/2023: Surety Bond by Get Smart Bail Bonds - Marty Belding for $5,000.00; As5 1466905; Count: 1

Surety Bond by Get Smart Bail Bonds - Marty Belding for $10,000.00; As15 612188; Count: 2

01/04/2023: Surety Bond by Get Smart Bail Bonds - Marty Belding for $10,000.00; As15 612188; Count: 2

Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

01/12/2023: Application for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialNew Indigent Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Amount Due: 50.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status, Is Indigent: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Get Smart Bail Bonds - Marty Belding for $10,000.00; As15 612188; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond by Get Smart Bail Bonds - Marty Belding for $5,000.00; As5 1466905; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Appearance Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: First Appearance Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: BA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSet on First Appearance Hearing docket 1/3/2023 beginning at 2:00 PM Adams, Blake (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 1/30/2023 beginning at 8:30 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 812.014(2)(B)1 Grand Theft - $20,000 - < $100,000; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPrincipal 812.014(2)(C)6 Grand Theft - Motor Vehicle < $100,000; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • ChargeGrand Theft - $20,000 - < $100,000; Count: 2; Statute #: 812.014(2)(b)1; Offense Level: FS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • ChargeGrand Theft - Motor Vehicle < $100,000; Count: 1; Statute #: 812.014(2)(c)6; Offense Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less