This case was last updated from Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/23/2022 at 10:01:18 (UTC).

Alvarez JR, Javier

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Alvarez JR, Javier was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Collier County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Collier County Courthouse located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Defendant

Alvarez JR, Javier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Day Jr, Donald Paul

Wilson, Tammera Jamell

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

08/03/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

Deferred Prosecution Agreement

08/03/2022: Deferred Prosecution Agreement

Witness List

07/20/2022: Witness List

Notice to Appear

07/18/2022: Notice to Appear

Notice of Discovery

07/15/2022: Notice of Discovery

Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

07/14/2022: Information/Indictment/Petition Filed On Counts

Certificate of Discharge of Bond

07/14/2022: Certificate of Discharge of Bond

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 2

07/14/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION/PETITION ON COUNT 2

E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

07/14/2022: E-filed Information/Notice to Clerk

Waiver of Appearance

07/01/2022: Waiver of Appearance

Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

06/30/2022: Notice of Appearance from Day Jr, Donald Paul, Plea of Not Guilty, Request for Trial, Non Jury Trial or Hearing and Initial Pleadings

Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; U10-21358286; Count: 2

06/27/2022: Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; U10-21358286; Count: 2

Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; U10-21358288; Count: 1

06/27/2022: Surety Bond by Bo Bail Bonds Inc - Gerald Redding for $5,000.00; U10-21358288; Count: 1

Driving Record

06/24/2022: Driving Record

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

06/24/2022: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

JIS Certificate

06/24/2022: JIS Certificate

Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

06/24/2022: Certificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

Jail Arrest Card

06/24/2022: Jail Arrest Card

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Early Resolution Hearings; Location: Naples; Room: EVK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCancelled Early Resolution Hearings on 8/16/2022 1:30:00 PM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Discharge of Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeferred Prosecution Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWitness List

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Arraignment - Felony; Location: Naples; Room: 3-4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotices Printed/Electronically Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketContinued to 8/16/2022 1:30 PM Early Resolution Hearings Krier, Elizabeth V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketPled Not Guilty; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJIS Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Jessica Lunsford Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJail Arrest Card

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSet on Arraignment - Felony docket 7/18/2022 beginning at 8:15 AM Krier, Elizabeth V (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation # AFUDDLE for 893.13(1)(a)2 issued on 06/23/2022 by Collier County Sheriff Office; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(6)(A) Possession Controlled Substance; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBooking Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPrincipal 893.13(1)(A)2 Possession Of Synthetic Cannabinoids; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • ChargePossession of Synthetic Cannabinoids; Count: 2; Statute #: 893.13(1)(a)2; Disposition Date: 2022-07-14; Citation #: AFUDDLE; Offense Level: FT; Prosecutor Action: Notice of No Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • ChargePossession Controlled Substance; Court Action: Pre-Trial Diversion; Count: 1; Statute #: 893.13(6)(a); Disposition Date: 2022-08-03; Offense Level: FT; Plea Date: 2022-07-18; Prosecutor Action: Information Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Day Jr, Donald Paul

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilson, Tammera Jamell