Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 04/25/2020 at 18:02:51 (UTC).

Williamceau Thomas, Sidonne S VS Williamceau, Jimi

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 Williamceau Thomas, Sidonne S filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Williamceau, Jimi. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cupp, Scott H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cupp, Scott H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Williamceau Thomas, Sidonne S

Respondent

Williamceau, Jimi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Simplified Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2019-10-03 Instrument# 5772990

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD; Location: Naples; Room: SHC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketPresent: Jimi Williamceau (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketPresent: Sidonne S Williamceau Thomas (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Cupp, Scott H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketProceeding: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketPaid $411.50 on receipt 1052262, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: $3.5; Amount Paid: $3.5; Due Date: 2019-09-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketDisclosure From Non Lawyer

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Williamceau, Jimi, issue date 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2019-10-03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Williamceau Thomas, Sidonne S, issue date 09/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Final Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketSet on Simplified/Name Changes/UCD docket 10/3/2019 beginning at 9:00 AM Cupp, Scott H (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketPetition for Simplified Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: $408.0; Amount Paid: $408.0; Due Date: 2019-09-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less