Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 07/07/2020 at 11:50:06 (UTC).

State Of Fl Dept Of Rev Obo David Allen Withrow Sr Et Al VS Withrow, Alicia Marie

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 State Of Fl Dept Of Rev Obo David Allen Withrow Sr filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against Withrow, Alicia Marie. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cupp, Scott H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cupp, Scott H

 

Party Details

Petitioners

State Of Fl Dept Of Rev Obo David Allen Withrow Sr

Withrow Sr, David Allen

Respondent

Withrow, Alicia Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Merrill, Randy Edward

Attorney at Department Of Revenue

15275 Collier Blvd Ste 201 Box 560

Naples, FL 34119-6750

Respondent Attorney

Davis, Jessica Presley

Attorney at Family First Legal Group

2950 Immokalee Rd Ste 2

Naples, FL 34110

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance with Mandatory Disclosure by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Davis, Jessica Presley for Alicia Marie Withrow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss by Alicia Marie Withrow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on Withrow, Alicia Marie, served 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketUnified Family Court Reassignment to Cupp, Scott H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketSupport IV-D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDOR Demographic Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Due Date: 2019-12-27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketPetition to Establish Child Support & Other Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner and Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDOR Demographic Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State of FL, Dept of Revenue is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, JESSICA PRESLEY