Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 06/01/2020 at 01:24:22 (UTC).

Sarmiento Camacho, Walfredo Enrique VS Garces Blanco, Naylu Karina

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Sarmiento Camacho, Walfredo Enrique filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Garces Blanco, Naylu Karina. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sarmiento Camacho, Walfredo Enrique

Respondent

Garces Blanco, Naylu Karina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dieppa, Eduardo Enrique III

Attorney at Dieppa Law Firm, P.A.

2097 W 76Th St

Hialeah, FL 330161834

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2020-01-27 Instrument# 5820249

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: Uncontested Divorce @ 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketStand in Attorney Valerie Maurer for Attorney Eduardo Dieppa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPresent: Naylu Karina Garces Blanco (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPresent: Walfredo Enrique Sarmiento Camacho (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProceeding: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSet on Hearing docket 1/24/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing and Motion Uncontested Divorce @ 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketPaid $408.00 on receipt 1067230, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: $408.0; Amount Paid: $408.0; Due Date: 2019-11-04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketFact Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2020-01-24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with No Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dieppa, Eduardo E., III