Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twetntieth Circuit Courts - Collier County on 07/22/2021 at 05:20:57 (UTC).

Rostron, Francis VS Progressive Property Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Rostron, Francis filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Property Insurance Company. This case was filed in Twetntieth Circuit Courts - Collier County, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Twetntieth Circuit Courts - Collier County

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rostron, Francis

Defendant

Progressive Property Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Constable, James Scott

Attorney at Constable Law Pa

139 6Th Ave S

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Gowland Jr, Charles Louis

Attorney at Constable Law Pa

5604 Rush Springs Ct

Raleigh, NC 27617

Defendant Attorneys

Haas, Raymond A

Attorney at Hd Law Partners

Po Box 23567

Tampa, FL 336233567

Perotti, A. Michael

Attorney at Hd Law Partners

Post Office Box 23567

Tampa, FL 33623

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

05/10/2021: Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Production

05/10/2021: Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense by Progressive Property Insurance Company with Demand for Jury Trial

05/10/2021: Answer and Affirmative Defense by Progressive Property Insurance Company with Demand for Jury Trial

Designation of E-Mail Address

04/12/2021: Designation of E-Mail Address

Paid $410.00 on receipt 1178521, Fully Paid

03/22/2021: Paid $410.00 on receipt 1178521, Fully Paid

Standing Order - Circuit

03/19/2021: Standing Order - Circuit

Designation of E-Mail Address

03/19/2021: Designation of E-Mail Address

Summons issued

03/19/2021: Summons issued

Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

03/19/2021: Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

03/19/2021: Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense by Progressive Property Insurance Company with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of E-Mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $410.00 on receipt 1178521, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil General; Amount Due: $400.0; Amount Paid: $400.0; Due Date: 2021-03-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of E-Mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketInsurance Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEROTTI , A. MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAAS, RAYMOND A