This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 05/08/2021 at 05:47:33 (UTC).

Raymond Building Supply Llc VS Lopez, Felix Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Raymond Building Supply Llc filed an Other lawsuit against Lopez, Felix. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin, Janeice T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Martin, Janeice T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raymond Building Supply Llc

Defendants

Unknown Spouse Of Samuel Miller

Unknown Tenants Occupants

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

Lopez, Felix

Silmar Investments Llc

Saggio Develop Corp

Miller, Samuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hyatt, Joel William

Attorney at Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP

2400 First St Ste 300

Fort Myers, FL 339012982

 

Court Documents

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Silmar Investments Llc, Saggio Develop Corp, Miller, Samuel, Lopez, Felix, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Unknown Spouse Of Samuel Miller, Unknown Tenants Occupants

12/22/2020: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Silmar Investments Llc, Saggio Develop Corp, Miller, Samuel, Lopez, Felix, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Unknown Spouse Of Samuel Miller, Unknown Tenants Occupants

Paid $375.00 on receipt 1139063, Fully Paid

10/01/2020: Paid $375.00 on receipt 1139063, Fully Paid

Notice of Lis Pendens

09/29/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens

Summons issued

09/29/2020: Summons issued

Summons issued

09/29/2020: Summons issued

Summons issued

09/29/2020: Summons issued

Summons issued

09/29/2020: Summons issued

Summons issued

09/29/2020: Summons issued

Summons issued

09/29/2020: Summons issued

Summons issued

09/29/2020: Summons issued

Complaint

09/23/2020: Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

09/23/2020: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal Silmar Investments Llc, Saggio Develop Corp, Miller, Samuel, Lopez, Felix, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Unknown Spouse Of Samuel Miller, Unknown Tenants Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $375.00 on receipt 1139063, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Claim > $2500 to $15,000; Amount Due: $305.0; Amount Paid: $305.0; Due Date: 2020-10-01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-10-01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-10-01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-10-01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-10-01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-10-01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-10-01

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCounty Civil >$8,000 - $15,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCourt Action: Dismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2020-12-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Raymond Building Supply Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hyatt, Joel William