Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 05/04/2020 at 06:36:04 (UTC).

Ramirez Vasquez, Rubi VS Gonzalez JR, Victor

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Ramirez Vasquez, Rubi filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Gonzalez JR, Victor. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cupp, Scott H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cupp, Scott H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ramirez Vasquez, Rubi

Respondent

Gonzalez JR, Victor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketOrder Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Completion of Parenting Class by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Gonzalez, Victor JR, issue date 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDesignation of E-mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDesignation of E-mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMarital Settlement Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketChild Support Guidelines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketParenting Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAnswer, Waiver, and Request for Copy of Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage by Victor Gonzalez JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Ramirez Vasquez, Rubi, issue date 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status & Determination, Is Indigent: Yes, Ramirez Vasquez, Rubi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Due Date: 2019-10-11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less