Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 05/23/2020 at 01:07:42 (UTC).

Petulla, Sheila Jeanne VS Skelly, Joseph Gordon

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Petulla, Sheila Jeanne filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Skelly, Joseph Gordon. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Petulla, Sheila Jeanne

Respondent

Skelly, Joseph Gordon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Simplified Dissolution of Marriage Recorded 2020-01-23 Instrument# 5818980

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPresent: Joseph Gordon Skelly (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPresent: Sheila Jeanne Petulla (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPresiding Judge: McGowan, John O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProceeding: Simplified/Name Changes/UCD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Simplified/Name Changes/UCD; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSet on Simplified/Name Changes/UCD docket 1/23/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCancelled Simplified/Name Changes/UCD on 12/11/2019 9:00:00 AM due to Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPaid $408.00 on receipt 1068599, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Petulla, Sheila Jeanne, issue date 09/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • ChargeCourt Action: Disposed by Judge; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2020-01-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Final Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSet on Simplified/Name Changes/UCD docket 12/11/2019 beginning at 9:00 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPetition for Simplified Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Simplified Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: $408.0; Amount Paid: $408.0; Due Date: 2019-11-08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSimplified Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less