Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 13:41:28 (UTC).

Perez Natareno, Madelline Cole Et Al VS Martinez Montoya, Ezequiel

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 Perez Natareno, Madelline Cole filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against Martinez Montoya, Ezequiel. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cupp, Scott H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cupp, Scott H

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Perez Natareno, Madelline Cole

State Of Florida Department Of Revenue

Respondent

Martinez Montoya, Ezequiel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Merrill, Randy Edward

Attorney at Department Of Revenue

15275 Collier Blvd Ste 201 Box 560

Naples, FL 34119-6750

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: HO; Notes: Petition To Establish Child Support And Other Relief To Be Heard At 1 Pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSet on Hearing docket 3/5/2020 beginning at 1:00 PM Hearing Officer (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing for Petition To Establish Child Support And Other Relief To Be Heard At 1 Pm by DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on Martinez Montoya, Ezequiel, served 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Balance: $10.0; Due Date: 2019-12-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Due Date: 2019-12-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketReturn of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Due Date: 2019-10-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketSupport IV-D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDOR Demographic Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Due Date: 2019-08-29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketPetition to Establish Child Support & Other Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner and Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDOR Demographic Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Merrill, Randy Edward