This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 09/21/2021 at 05:09:49 (UTC).

Paniagua Buitron, Jose Roberto A VS Kivlin, Zarconia

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Paniagua Buitron, Jose Roberto A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Kivlin, Zarconia. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohen, Kyle S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cohen, Kyle S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Paniagua Buitron, Jose Roberto A

Respondent

Kivlin, Zarconia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketPaid $13.00 on receipt 1208418, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: $3.0; Amount Paid: $3.0; Due Date: 2021-07-26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-07-26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketPaid $413.90 on receipt 1208115, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Service Charges; Amount Due: $5.9; Amount Paid: $5.9; Due Date: 2021-07-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDesignation of E-mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Paniagua Buitron, Jose Roberto A, issue date 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with No Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: $408.0; Amount Paid: $408.0; Due Date: 2021-07-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less