This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/18/2022 at 10:12:25 (UTC).

Panagrossi, Dennis Et Al VS Arellano Brothers Framing Company Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Panagrossi, Dennis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Arellano Brothers Framing Company. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Hugh D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Hugh D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Panagrossi, Karen

Panagrossi, Dennis

Defendants

Ashton Tampa Residential Llc

Structural Building Components Llc

ASHTON WOODS HOMES

Arellano Brothers Framing Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schwebel Jr, Michael Lawrence

Frachtman, Joshua David

Defendant Attorneys

Zesinger, Andrew Peter

Klapsa, Katherine Lee

Dunigan, Chad Nathan

Kahin, Erin Pamela

Beebe, Brooke Erin

Pumilia, Joseph

Fink, Michael Gordon

Epstein, Andrew Scott

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Conference and Docket Sounding

10/15/2021: Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Conference and Docket Sounding

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

10/19/2021: Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Deposition

10/28/2021: Notice of Taking Deposition

Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration

10/13/2021: Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration

Request for Production

10/19/2021: Request for Production

Notice of Taking Deposition

10/26/2021: Notice of Taking Deposition

Agreed Case Management Plan and Order

10/12/2021: Agreed Case Management Plan and Order

Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

09/10/2021: Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

09/10/2021: Response to Request for Production

Paid $395.00 on receipt 1263083, Fully Paid

03/17/2022: Paid $395.00 on receipt 1263083, Fully Paid

Crossclaim

03/16/2022: Crossclaim

Motion to Amend Complaint/Petition with Amended Complaint/Petition Attached -

03/16/2022: Motion to Amend Complaint/Petition with Amended Complaint/Petition Attached -

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/01/2022: Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

03/01/2022: Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Copies

02/11/2022: Request for Copies

Notice of Taking Deposition

02/02/2022: Notice of Taking Deposition

Designation of E-Mail Address

02/01/2022: Designation of E-Mail Address

Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

02/01/2022: Notice of Service of Answered Interrogatories

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial; Location: Naples ; Room: HDH; Notes: notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Sounding; Location: Naples ; Room: HDH; Notes: notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Pre-Trial; Location: Naples ; Room: HDH; Notes: notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $395.00 on receipt 1263083, Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • ChargeCount: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • FinancialCircuit Civil General Cross Counter 3rd Party; Amount Due: $395.0; Amount Paid: $395.0; Due Date: 2022-03-17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCrossclaim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Amend Complaint/Petition with Amended Complaint/Petition Attached -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNegligence - Other Negligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint with Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less