Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 05:16:31 (UTC).

Palmeri, Dominic Et Al VS Abm Industries Incorporated Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Palmeri, Dominic filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Abm Industries Incorporated. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Krier, Elizabeth V. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Krier, Elizabeth V

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Palmeri, Patricia

Palmeri, Dominic

Defendants

Abm Industries Incorporated

Abm Industry Groups Llc

Gca Services Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mohney, Douglas Dale

Attorney at Avard Law Offices Pa

Po Box 101110

Cape Coral, FL 339101110

Defendant Attorneys

Morvay, Robert Stephen

Attorney at Murray, Morin & Herman Pa

3550 Buschwood Park Dr Ste 130

Tampa, FL 33618

Morin, Christopher S

Attorney at Murray Morin & Herman Pa

3550 Buschwood Park Drive Suite 130, Murray Marin & Herman Pa

Tampa, FL 33618

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Morin, Christopher S, Morvay, Robert Stephen for Gca Services Group Inc

04/06/2021: Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Morin, Christopher S, Morvay, Robert Stephen for Gca Services Group Inc

Complaint, Amended

04/02/2021: Complaint, Amended

Return of Service of Summons on Abm Industries Incorporated,, served 03/19/2021

03/25/2021: Return of Service of Summons on Abm Industries Incorporated,, served 03/19/2021

Return of Service of Summons on Abm Industry Groups Llc,, served 03/19/2021

03/25/2021: Return of Service of Summons on Abm Industry Groups Llc,, served 03/19/2021

Return of Service of Summons on Gca Services Group Inc,, served 03/19/2021

03/25/2021: Return of Service of Summons on Gca Services Group Inc,, served 03/19/2021

Paid $430.00 on receipt 1176761, Fully Paid

03/15/2021: Paid $430.00 on receipt 1176761, Fully Paid

Standing Order - Circuit

03/15/2021: Standing Order - Circuit

Summons issued

03/15/2021: Summons issued

Summons issued

03/15/2021: Summons issued

Summons issued

03/15/2021: Summons issued

Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

03/15/2021: Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

03/15/2021: Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Morin, Christopher S, Morvay, Robert Stephen for Gca Services Group Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint, Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on Gca Services Group Inc,, served 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on Abm Industries Incorporated,, served 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on Abm Industry Groups Llc,, served 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $430.00 on receipt 1176761, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil General; Amount Due: $400.0; Amount Paid: $400.0; Due Date: 2021-03-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNegligence - Other Negligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCA Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORVAY , ROBERT STEPHEN