This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 05/12/2020 at 03:20:40 (UTC).

Ohi Asset (Fl) Sebring Llc Et Al VS Wagner III, George P

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Ohi Asset Fl Sebring Llc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Wagner III, George P. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brodie, Lauren L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brodie, Lauren L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ohi Asset (Va) Martinsville Snf, Llc

Ohi Asset (Fl) Sebring Llc

Ohi Asset (Nc) Warsaw Llc

Ohi Asset (Va) Martinsville Alf Llc

Defendant

Wagner III, George P

Garnishee

Bessemer Trust Company Of Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hildreth, Mark David

 

Court Documents

Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wagner, George P III

12/16/2019: Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wagner, George P III

Certified Copy of Foreign Judgment & Affidavit Recorded 2019-10-08 Instrument# 5774612

10/04/2019: Certified Copy of Foreign Judgment & Affidavit Recorded 2019-10-08 Instrument# 5774612

Writ of Garnishment

11/12/2019: Writ of Garnishment

Motion to Complete and Return Fact Information Sheet -

12/02/2019: Motion to Complete and Return Fact Information Sheet -

Answer Of Garnishee

11/27/2019: Answer Of Garnishee

Notice of Dissolution of Writ of Garnishment as to Bessemer Trust Company Of Florida,

12/03/2019: Notice of Dissolution of Writ of Garnishment as to Bessemer Trust Company Of Florida,

Cover Letter

12/05/2019: Cover Letter

Motion for Writ of Garnishment Ohi Asset (Va) Martinsville Snf, Llc, Ohi Asset (Fl) Sebring Llc, Ohi Asset (Va) Martinsville Alf Llc, Ohi Asset (Nc) Warsaw Llc

11/12/2019: Motion for Writ of Garnishment Ohi Asset (Va) Martinsville Snf, Llc, Ohi Asset (Fl) Sebring Llc, Ohi Asset (Va) Martinsville Alf Llc, Ohi Asset (Nc) Warsaw Llc

Notice Of Recording And Certified Copy Of Foreign Judgment And Affidavit Sent by Certified Mail

10/08/2019: Notice Of Recording And Certified Copy Of Foreign Judgment And Affidavit Sent by Certified Mail

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy Wagner, George P III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Complete and Return Fact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dissolution of Writ of Garnishment as to Bessemer Trust Company Of Florida,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Complete and Return Fact Information Sheet -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Of Garnishee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answer Of Garnishee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $85.00 on receipt 1070228, Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Writ of Garnishment Ohi Asset (Va) Martinsville Snf, Llc, Ohi Asset (Fl) Sebring Llc, Ohi Asset (Va) Martinsville Alf Llc, Ohi Asset (Nc) Warsaw Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment Submitted by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Recording And Certified Copy Of Foreign Judgment And Affidavit Sent by Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Recording Foreign Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $449.00 on receipt 1059898, Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Foreign Judgments; Amount Due: $449.0; Amount Paid: $449.0; Due Date: 2019-10-07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketForeign Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Foreign Judgment & Affidavit Recorded 2019-10-08 Instrument# 5774612

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less