Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 05/04/2020 at 01:25:27 (UTC).

Nickel, Stephanie Ruth VS Barton, Alfred David

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Nickel, Stephanie Ruth filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Barton, Alfred David. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cupp, Scott H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cupp, Scott H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nickel, Stephanie Ruth

Respondent

Barton, Alfred David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Fish, Monica Cecile

Attorney at The Law Office Of Monica C Fish

3675 43Rd Ave Ne

Naples, FL 34120

Respondent Attorney

Karim, Matthew Zaheer

Attorney at The Law Offices Of A K Esquire Pllc

3000 Ne 30Th Pl Ste 306

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33306

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Completion of Parenting Class by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketAffidavit in Compliance with Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer by Alfred David Barton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketOrder On Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management; Location: Naples; Room: SHC; Notes: 10:00 A M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSet on Case Management docket 3/3/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM Cupp, Scott H (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder Scheduling Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder Scheduling Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status & Determination, Is Indigent: Yes, Nickel, Stephanie Ruth (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Due Date: 2019-10-11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less