This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/18/2022 at 09:55:47 (UTC).

Miller, Bertha VS Millennium Physician Group Llc

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Miller, Bertha filed an Other lawsuit against Millennium Physician Group Llc. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin, Janeice T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Martin, Janeice T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miller, Bertha

Defendant

Millennium Physician Group Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodal, Yechezkel

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan Pa

8151 Peters Rd Fl 4

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

03/08/2021: Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

Summons issued

03/08/2021: Summons issued

Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

03/08/2021: Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Admissions

03/08/2021: Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/08/2021: Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

03/08/2021: Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Paid $310.00 on receipt 1175002, Fully Paid

03/08/2021: Paid $310.00 on receipt 1175002, Fully Paid

Return of Service of Summons on Millennium Physician Group Llc,, served 03/10/2021

03/19/2021: Return of Service of Summons on Millennium Physician Group Llc,, served 03/10/2021

Motion for Clerk's Default

04/28/2021: Motion for Clerk's Default

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Clerk's Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on Millennium Physician Group Llc,, served 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $310.00 on receipt 1175002, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialCounty Civil Claim > $2500 to $15,000; Amount Due: $300.0; Amount Paid: $300.0; Due Date: 2021-03-08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCounty Civil >$8,000 - $15,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialCounty Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2021-03-08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Millennium Physician Group Llc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodal, Yechezkel