This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Collier County on 10/31/2021 at 05:11:22 (UTC).

Linton, Dimitri Et Al VS Wci Communities Llc

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Linton, Dimitri filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Wci Communities Llc. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Collier County, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Hugh D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Hugh D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linton, Dimitri

Martinez, Diana

Defendant

Wci Communities Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moskowitz, Laurence

Attorney at Larry Moskowitz Pa

400 Se 9Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33319

Defendant Attorney

Hoffman, Jennifer Anderson

Attorney at Marlow Adler Abrams Newman & Lewis

4000 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 570

Coral Gables, FL 331461431

 

Court Documents

Correspondence to Clerk, from Counsel

05/11/2021: Correspondence to Clerk, from Counsel

Correspondence to Counsel, from Clerk

06/04/2021: Correspondence to Counsel, from Clerk

Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to Collier County from Broward County

06/18/2021: Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to Collier County from Broward County

Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

06/18/2021: Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial

Standing Order - Circuit

06/18/2021: Standing Order - Circuit

Notice to Attorney of Writ of Possession Procedure Change

06/18/2021: Notice to Attorney of Writ of Possession Procedure Change

Civil Transfer Paperwork

06/18/2021: Civil Transfer Paperwork

Correspondence to Clerk, from Broward County Clerk

06/18/2021: Correspondence to Clerk, from Broward County Clerk

Notice Of Case Transfer

06/18/2021: Notice Of Case Transfer

Notice Of Receipt Of File

06/18/2021: Notice Of Receipt Of File

Paid $400.00 on receipt 1200697, Fully Paid

06/22/2021: Paid $400.00 on receipt 1200697, Fully Paid

Problem Letter

06/22/2021: Problem Letter

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/14/2021: Notice of Taking Deposition

Answer and Affirmative Defense by Wci Communities Llc

07/26/2021: Answer and Affirmative Defense by Wci Communities Llc

Request for Production

09/17/2021: Request for Production

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense by Wci Communities Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProblem Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $400.00 on receipt 1200697, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialCircuit Civil General; Amount Due: $400.0; Amount Paid: $400.0; Due Date: 2021-06-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Receipt Of File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Case Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence to Clerk, from Broward County Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Transfer Paperwork

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Attorney of Writ of Possession Procedure Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint with Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Order Transferring Case to Collier County from Broward County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketContract and Indebtedness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence to Counsel, from Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence to Clerk, from Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WCI COMMUNITIES INC C/O VIVEN HASTINGS (REG AGENT) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moskowitz, Laurence