Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 02:01:52 (UTC).

Kurek, Jason VS Kurek, Sarah Elizabeth

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Kurek, Jason filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Kurek, Sarah Elizabeth. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kurek, Jason

Respondent

Kurek, Sarah Elizabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cliff, Cary Alan

Attorney at Cary Alan Cliff P A

599 9Th St N Ste 300

Naples, FL 341025624

Respondent Attorney

Lanier, Suzanne D

Attorney at Ross Lanier and Deifik P A

599 Ninth Street N Ste 300

Naples, FL 341025624

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: Motion For Temporary Relief At 3:00Pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Pre-Trial; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSet on Pre-Trial docket 3/17/2020 beginning at 1:30 PM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSet on Hearing docket 3/18/2020 beginning at 1:30 PM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing for Motion For Temporary Relief At 3:00Pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketOrder Setting Pretrial and Trial Cycle Commencing March 30 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOrder Following Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketMotion for Temporary Relief - by Kurek, Sarah Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: 10:00 A M

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Kurek, Jason, issue date 06/22/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2019-08-30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Completion of Parenting Class by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Military Service for Kurek, Sarah E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cliff, Cary Alan