Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 11:09:58 (UTC).

Knott, Tracey L VS Knott, Christopher T

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Knott, Tracey L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Knott, Christopher T. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Knott, Tracey L

Respondent

Knott, Christopher T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Long Jr, John Edward

Attorney at Long Murphy & Long P A

1300 3Rd St S Ste 302B

Naples, FL 341027237

Respondent Attorney

Tarnow, Herman Harris

Attorney at Tarnow & Associates Family Lawyers Pllc

1415 Panther Ln

Naples, FL 34109

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address for Retained Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address for Retained Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance with Mandatory Disclosure by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Counterpetition by Tracey L Knott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPaid $392.50 on receipt 1088600, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCount: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution Counter Petition; Amount Due: $392.5; Amount Paid: $392.5; Due Date: 2020-01-29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer and Counterpetition for Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketGeneral Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Military Service for Knott, Christopher T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Designation of Email Address by Long Jr, John Edward for Tracey L Knott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Long Jr, John Edward