Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 00:14:59 (UTC).

Jacobs, Quortni Marie VS Jacobs, Scott

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 Jacobs, Quortni Marie filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Jacobs, Scott. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jacobs, Quortni Marie

Respondent

Jacobs, Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Talarico, Mayra

Attorney at The Law Office Of Mayra Talarico

5629 Strand Blvd Ste 402

Naples, FL 34110

Respondent Attorney

Santana, Jr Jorge J

Attorney at Powell, Jackman, Stevens & Ricciardi P A

4575 Via Royale Suite 200

Fort Myers, FL 33919

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: Final Hearing @ 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSet on Hearing docket 3/24/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Pre-Trial; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCancelled Pre-Trial on 2/18/2020 1:30:00 PM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing for Final Hearing @ 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketParenting Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketPaid $120.00 on receipt 1092363, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Court Ordered Mediation $120; Amount Due: $120.0; Amount Paid: $120.0; Due Date: 2020-02-12

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing Copies of Application For Determination Of Civil Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketApplication for Indigent Status & Determination, Is Indigent: Yes, Jacobs, Quortni Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMotion for Temporary Relief - by Jacobs, Quortni Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance with Mandatory Disclosure by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less