This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 08:19:00 (UTC).

Irizarry, Gabriel VS Copello, Ricardo

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Irizarry, Gabriel filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Copello, Ricardo. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Cupp, Scott H and Cohen, Kyle S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Cupp, Scott H

Cohen, Kyle S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Irizarry, Gabriel

Respondent

Copello, Ricardo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketPer Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Cohen, Kyle S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketReturn Of Service Of Final Injunction On Copello, Ricardo Served 04/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment of Injunction for Protection Against Domestic Violence With Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Domestic Violence Hearing; Location: Naples; Room: SHC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketSurrender Firearms/Ammunition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketMay not come w/i 100 feet of Petitioner's automobile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketInjunction Issued for Until Further Order of The Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketPresent: Gabriel Irizarry (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketPresiding Judge: Cupp, Scott H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketProceeding: Domestic Violence Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service of Temporary Injunction on Copello, Ricardo served 03/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketInstructions for Surrender of Firearms or Order for Affidavit of No Firearms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketTemporary Injunction for Protection Against Domestic Violence Without Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketSet on Domestic Violence Hearing docket 4/6/2020 beginning at 1:30 PM Cupp, Scott H (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Injunction for Protection Against Domestic Violence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketInformation on Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketInformation on Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDomestic Violence

    Read MoreRead Less