This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Collier County on 02/02/2021 at 09:59:19 (UTC).

Hertel & Associates Llc VS Kdg Llc

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Hertel Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kdg Llc. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Collier County, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brodie, Lauren L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brodie, Lauren L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hertel & Associates Llc

Defendant

Kdg Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Muller, Mark Hubert

Attorney at Mark H. Muller, P.A.

5150 Tamiami Trl N Ste 303

Naples, FL 341032818

Defendant Attorney

Slack, Mark Alan

Attorney at Woods Weidermiller Michetti & Rudnick Pllc

9045 Strada Stell Ct Ste 400

Naples, FL 341094438

 

Court Documents

Return of Service of Subpoena

01/28/2021: Return of Service of Subpoena

Order Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager

08/12/2020: Order Scheduling Case Management Conference with Case Manager

Certificate of Service

11/05/2020: Certificate of Service

Return of Service of Subpoena

01/27/2021: Return of Service of Subpoena

Answer to Counterclaim by Hertel & Associates Llc

07/13/2020: Answer to Counterclaim by Hertel & Associates Llc

Return of Service of Subpoena

01/14/2021: Return of Service of Subpoena

Notice of Compliance with Request for Copies

01/27/2021: Notice of Compliance with Request for Copies

Summons issued

02/13/2020: Summons issued

Return of Service of Subpoena

01/13/2021: Return of Service of Subpoena

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Jury Trial; Location: Naples; Room: LLB; Notes: notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial; Location: Naples; Room: LLB; Notes: notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Sounding; Location: Naples; Room: LLB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Pre-Trial; Location: Naples; Room: LLB; Notes: notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance with Request for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Effectuate Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $410.00 on receipt 1092979, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil General; Amount Due: $400.0; Amount Paid: $400.0; Due Date: 2020-02-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketContract and Indebtedness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2020-02-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.D.G., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Slack, Mark Alan