This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Collier County on 03/27/2020 at 01:12:47 (UTC).

Hennessy, James VS Costco Wholesale Corporation Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 Hennessy, James filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Collier County, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Hugh D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Hugh D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hennessy, James

Defendants

Pacific Seafood Co., Inc.

Costco Wholesale Corporation

PACIFIC SEAFOOD DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fowler, Mary A

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

09/25/2019: Civil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial

09/25/2019: Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial

Summons issued

09/25/2019: Summons issued

Summons issued

09/25/2019: Summons issued

Standing Order - Circuit

09/25/2019: Standing Order - Circuit

Paid $420.00 on receipt 1057177, Fully Paid

09/26/2019: Paid $420.00 on receipt 1057177, Fully Paid

Return of Service of Summons on Costco Wholesale Corporation,, served 09/30/2019

10/11/2019: Return of Service of Summons on Costco Wholesale Corporation,, served 09/30/2019

Return of Service of Summons on Pacific Seafood Co., Inc.,, served 09/30/2019

10/11/2019: Return of Service of Summons on Pacific Seafood Co., Inc.,, served 09/30/2019

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pacific Seafood Co., Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation

01/15/2020: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pacific Seafood Co., Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal Pacific Seafood Co., Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on Costco Wholesale Corporation,, served 09/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons on Pacific Seafood Co., Inc.,, served 09/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid $420.00 on receipt 1057177, Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil General; Amount Due: $400.0; Amount Paid: $400.0; Due Date: 2019-09-26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNegligence - Other Negligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet with Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • ChargeCourt Action: Dismissed Before Hearing Other; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2020-01-15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2019-09-26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2019-09-26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order - Circuit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint & Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less