Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 05/04/2020 at 01:49:01 (UTC).

Hagerstrom, Marley VS Thompson Hagerstrom, Erika Athena

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Hagerstrom, Marley filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Thompson Hagerstrom, Erika Athena. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowan, John O. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McGowan, John O

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hagerstrom, Marley

Respondent

Thompson Hagerstrom, Erika Athena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cliff, Cary Alan

Attorney at Cary Alan Cliff P A

599 9Th St N Ste 300

Naples, FL 341025624

Respondent Attorney

Shemkus, Michael Mackay

Attorney at Long Murphy & Zung Pa

700 5Th Ave S 2Nd Fl

Naples, FL 34102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: 10:00 A M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Hearing; Location: Naples ; Room: JOM; Notes: Motion To Compel (10:00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCancelled Hearing on 4/27/2020 9:45:00 AM due to per JACs - to be reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketSet on Hearing docket 4/27/2020 beginning at 9:45 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketPer Judge's Calendar Motion To Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketSet on Case Management docket 6/9/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM McGowan, John O (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketOrder Scheduling Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Abatement

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketPaid $418.00 on receipt 1066545, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: $408.0; Amount Paid: $408.0; Due Date: 2019-11-01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCopy of Florida Drivers License/Identification Card for Hagerstrom, Marley, issue date 03/21/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • ChargeCount: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2019-11-01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cliff, Cary Alan