Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collier County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 00:40:54 (UTC).

Gulyas, Esther F VS Birchmeier, William A

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Gulyas, Esther F filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Birchmeier, William A. This case was filed in Collier County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collier, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cupp, Scott H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************1-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collier County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collier, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cupp, Scott H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gulyas, Esther F

Respondent

Birchmeier, William A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Perlow, Jeffry Steven

Attorney at Jeffry S. Perlow

5425 Park Central Ct

Naples, FL 341095934

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - Case Management; Location: Naples; Room: SHC; Notes: 11:00 A M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCancelled Case Management on 3/3/2020 9:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal Birchmeier, William A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSet on Case Management docket 3/3/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM Cupp, Scott H (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder Scheduling Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence to Clerk, from Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketPaid $418.00 on receipt 1053880, Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Dissolution of Marriage; Amount Due: $408.0; Amount Paid: $408.0; Due Date: 2019-09-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketDissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • ChargeCourt Action: Dismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing; Count: 1; Disposition Date: 2020-02-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • FinancialCircuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: $10.0; Amount Paid: $10.0; Due Date: 2019-09-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketStanding Order - Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketSummons issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/1975
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage with No Child(ren)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perlow, Jeffry Steven